Australian Golden Securities Pty Ltd is a Victoria based Australian Private Company registered 8th April 2010. It's registered for GST.
Entity Info
Business Name | Australian Golden Securities Pty Ltd |
---|---|
Previous Business Name | AFS Capital Securities Ltd |
Previous Business Name | Australian Golden Securities Ltd |
Entity Type | Australian Private Company |
Status | Active |
GST Registered | 8 April 2010(14 years, 5 months ago) |
ABN & ACN
Company Number | ACN 143 006 151 |
---|---|
Business Number | ABN 36 143 006 151 |
ABN From | 8 April 2010(14 years, 5 months ago) |
ABN Last Updated | 5 May 2022(2 years, 4 months ago) |
History
ABN Last Updated | From 11 September 2014 to 11 October 2017Oct 2017 |
---|---|
Entity Name | From "AFS Capital Securities Ltd" to "Australian Golden Securities Ltd"Oct 2017 |
ABN Last Updated | From 11 October 2017 to 6 February 2018Feb 2018 |
Postcode | From 3000 to 3004Feb 2018 |
ABN Last Updated | From 6 February 2018 to 8 April 2020Jul 2020 |
Postcode | From 3004 to 3144Jul 2020 |
ABN Last Updated | From 8 April 2020 to 1 December 2020Jan 2021 |
Entity Name | From "Australian Golden Securities Ltd" to "Australian Golden Securities Pty Ltd"Jan 2021 |
ABN Last Updated | From 1 December 2020 to 17 December 2021Jan 2022 |
Entity Type | From Australian Public Company to Australian Private CompanyJan 2022 |
ABN Last Updated | From 17 December 2021 to 5 May 2022May 2022 |
Postcode | From 3144 to 3000May 2022 |
Location
State | Victoria (VIC) |
---|---|
Postcode | 3000 |
Postcode Area | Melbourne |
The content on this website derives from public data sourced from the Australian Business Register (ABR). To request the removal of details, please contact the ABR about suppressing information. Subsequently, Australia Check will update automatically. The Registrar of the ABR, the Commonwealth, and this website do not assure the accuracy, timeliness, or completeness of the information provided through this service, nor do they accept liability for any issues arising from its use or reliance. This information was last verified against the ABR records on 25 September 2024.